Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Winery Off-Site Permit and Wine Festival Permit
Sponsored by
Delegate Barkley
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of the Comptroller to collect a fee for a winery off-site permit and a wine festival permit; repealing a requirement that the Comptroller collect a fee for a winery special event permit; repealing provisions that provide for a winery special event permit; repealing provisions that provide for a farmer's market permit; establishing a winery off-site permit to be issued by the Comptroller; authorizing the Comptroller to issue a winery off-site permit to specified persons who meet specified requirements; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {963092/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/20 (Delegate Morhaim) Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Morhaim) {343127/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2013 3/14/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Favorable with Amendments {963092/1 Report Adopted 48A
House 3/18/2013 3/15/2013 Special Order until 3/20 (Delegate Morhaim) Adopted 48A
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Floor Amendment (Delegate Morhaim) {343127/1 Adopted 50
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 54
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 52
Senate 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 64
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-101, 2-102, 2-103, 2-104, 7.5-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM