Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Education - Accountability - Consolidated State Plan and Support and Improvement Plans (Protect Our Schools Act of 2017)
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Tarlau, Mosby, M. Washington, A. Washington, C. Howard, Turner, Kaiser, Ebersole, Patterson, D. Barnes, and Ali
Status
Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/5/2017) - Chapter 29
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an educational accountability program to include at least three school quality indicators that measure the comparative opportunities provided to students or the level of student success in public schools; prohibiting the school quality indicators from being based on student testing; requiring the State Board to establish a composite score that provides for a meaningful differentiation of schools under the school accountability system; authorizing a specified plan to include lengthening of the school year; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0871
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Accountability - Consolidated State Plan and Support and Improvement Plans (Protect Our Schools Act of 2017)
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {665462/1 Adopted 40
House 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/08 (Delegate Cluster) Adopted 40
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Floor Amendment {703925/1 (Delegate Cluster) Rejected (48-89) 41
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - Education - Accountability - Consolidated State Plan and Support and Improvement Plans (Protect Our Schools Act of 2017)
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (91-46) 43
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable with Amendments {934433/1 51
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Miller) Adopted 51
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Favorable with Amendments {934433/1 51
Senate 3/24/2017 3/22/2017 Motion Laid Over (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 51
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments {934433/1 52
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Committee Amendment Adopted 52
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 52
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Floor Amendment {823929/1 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted (32-13) 52
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Floor Amendment {693927/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (13-32) 52
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Floor Amendment {503526/1 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (13-33) 52
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Floor Amendment {503721/1 (Senator Serafini) Rejected (14-32) 52
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Floor Amendment {433821/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 52
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Floor Amendment {143922/1 (Senator Ferguson) Withdrawn 52
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Floor Amendment {743322/1 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted 53
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Floor Amendment {483821/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (14-33) 53
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Motion Limit Debate (Senator Peters) Adopted (33-14) 53
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 53
House 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 58
House 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Davis) Adopted (88-49) 58
House 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Third Reading Passed (87-50) 58
House 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Education - Accountability - Consolidated State Plan and Support and Improvement Plans (Protect Our Schools Act of 2017)
Post Passage 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Overridden (90-50) 64
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Overridden (32-15) 60
Post Passage 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/5/2017) - Chapter 29
Text - Chapter - Education - Accountability - Consolidated State Plan and Support and Improvement Plans (Protect Our Schools Act of 2017)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-203, 7-203.4 )
Last Updated: 11/13/2019 12:53 PM