Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Occupational Licenses - Denial for Criminal Conviction - Notice of Prohibition and Task Force
Sponsored by
Delegates Barron, Moon, Sydnor, and McCray
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that specified departments of State government and specified units in specified departments of State government are prohibited from denying a specified license to an applicant solely on the basis that the applicant has previously been convicted of a crime except in accordance with specified provisions of law; requiring specified departments of State government and each unit that issues specified licenses in specified departments to post specified notice on their Web sites in a specified manner; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0923
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 2-108 )
(   1-101, 2-111 )
(   1-101, 2-119 )
(   1-101, 1-205 )
(   1-101, 2-107.1 )
(   2-101, 2-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM