Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
**Veto override
   HB0980 - 2015RS
   CH0006 - 2016RS
Title
Election Law - Voting Rights - Ex-Felons
Sponsored by
Delegates McCray, Moon, Anderson, Angel, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Campos, Carr, Carter, Conaway, Cullison, Ebersole, Fennell, Frick, Gilchrist, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hayes, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Hixson, Holmes, C. Howard, Jalisi, Jones, Kelly, Korman, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, McIntosh, A. Miller, Morales, Oaks, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Reznik, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Smith, Sydnor, Tarlau, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vaughn, A. Washington, and M. Washington
Status
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 6 of 2016
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering specified qualifications for voter registration; and providing that individuals discharged from incarceration are qualified to register to vote.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0340
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable with Amendments {225062/1 Report Adopted 61
House 4/06/2015 3/31/2015 Special Order until 4/7 (Delegate Turner) Adopted 61
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate B. Wilson) {983325/1 Rejected (59-77) 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate McDonough) {853323/1 Rejected (1-128) 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Walker) {633227/1 Rejected (57-72) 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Motion Special Order until next session (Delegate Vogt) Rejected (52-84) 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Vogt) {153627/1 Rejected (54-77) 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (82-57) 63
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 60
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Second Reading Passed 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 66
House 4/13/2015 4/11/2015 Returned Passed 72
Post Passage 5/26/2015 5/22/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
House 1/14/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
House 1/14/2016 1/20/2016 Veto overridden (85-56)
Senate 1/21/2016 1/21/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/5/2016 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Senate 2/05/2016 2/05/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 2/9/2016 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Motion Postpone Indefinitely (Senator Hershey) Rejected (29-18)
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Veto sustained (28-18)
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Motion Reconsider Vote (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted (29-18)
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Veto overridden (29-18)
Post Passage 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 6 of 2016
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
4/07/2015 Amendments House - (Delegate Vogt) {153627/01 Rejected
4/06/2015 Amendments House - (Ways and Means) {225062/01 Adopted
4/07/2015 Amendments House - (Delegate Walker) {633227/01 Rejected
4/07/2015 Amendments House - (Delegate McDonough) {853323/01 Rejected
4/07/2015 Amendments House - (Delegate Wilson, B.) {983325/01 Rejected
2/13/2015 Text - First - Election Law - Voting Rights - Ex-Felons
4/07/2015 Text - Third - Election Law - Voting Rights - Ex-Felons
2/16/2016 Text - Chapter (2016) - Election Law - Voting Rights - Ex-Felons
7/08/2015 Governor's Veto Letter
4/03/2015 Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
4/13/2015 Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/25/2016 Vote - House Floor - Veto override (85-56) - 01/20/16
4/01/2015 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Wilson) {983325/1 Rejected (59-77) - 04/01/15
4/01/2015 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (McDonough) {853323/1 Rejected (1-128) - 04/01/15
4/01/2015 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Walker) {633227/1 Rejected (57-72) - 04/01/15
4/01/2015 Vote - House Floor - Motion Special Order until next session (Vogt) Rejected (52-84) - 04/01/15
4/01/2015 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Vogt) {153627/1 Rejected (54-77) - 04/01/15
4/02/2015 Vote - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (82-57) - 04/02/15
2/09/2016 Vote - Senate Floor - Motion Postpone Indefinitely (Hershey) Rejected (19-27) - 02/9/16
2/09/2016 Vote - Senate Floor - Veto sustained (28-18) - 02/9/16
2/09/2016 Vote - Senate Floor - Motion Reconsider (Klausmeier) adopted (29-18) - 02/9/16
2/09/2016 Vote - Senate Floor - Veto override (29-18) - 02/9/16
4/08/2015 Vote - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-15) - 04/08/15
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-202, 3-102 )
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:12 PM