Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Disciplinary Action Report - Publication on Web Site
Sponsored by
Delegate Gilchrist
Status
In the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners to publish on its Web site a report of a specified action of the Board regarding the suspension or revocation of a license issued by the Board if the action is subject to public inspection under a specified law.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2016 3/07/2016 Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
(   2-302, 2-311 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page