Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Third Degree Sexual Offense - Burglary
Sponsored by
Delegates Clippinger, Anderson, Arora, Dumais, Guzzone, Hough, Howard, A. Kelly, Lee, Luedtke, McComas, A. Miller, Parrott, Simmons, Valentino-Smith, Waldstreicher, and Wilson
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that engaging in sexual contact with another without the consent of the other in connection with a first, second, or third degree burglary constitutes sexual offense in the third degree; establishing that, to be convicted under a specified provision of law, the defendant must also be convicted of a specified crime; altering the definitions of "tier I sex offender", "tier II sex offender", and "tier III sex offender" applicable to provisions relating to sex offender registration to include specified acts; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0722
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {732519/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
52
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2013 3/22/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments {732519/1 Report Adopted 52
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 53
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 52
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-307 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM