Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined or Whose Conviction or Adjudication Is Reversed (The Walter Lomax Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Dumais, Barron, Cardin, Conaway, Cox, Crutchfield, D.M. Davis, W. Fisher, Lopez, Shetty, Rosenberg, and Williams
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the State's Attorney to certify that a conviction was in error under certain circumstances; altering a provision of law to require, rather than authorize, the Board of Public Works to pay certain compensation to a certain individual who has been erroneously convicted, sentenced, and confined on a finding of eligibility by an administrative law judge within 90 days after receiving the order; requiring certain compensation made by the Board to be equal to a certain amount; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0797
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {992510/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {642218/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-9)
Proceedings
49A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {968576/1
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Committee Amendment {968576/1
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Motion Limit Debate (Senator King) Rejected (28-15)
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Motion Reconsider (Senator Young) Adopted (29-15)
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Motion Limit Debate (Senator Young) Adopted (29-15)
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Committee Amendment {968576/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {653729/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (17-28)
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {103621/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Rejected (29-15)
Proceedings
53C
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined or Whose Conviction or Adjudication Is Reversed
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {992510/1 Adopted 48
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted 48
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Floor Committee Amendment {642218/1 Adopted 48A
House 3/15/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
Text - Third - Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined or Whose Conviction or Adjudication Is Reversed (The Walter Lomax Act)
House 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (123-9) 49A
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 51
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments {968576/1 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Committee Amendment {968576/1 53C
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Motion Limit Debate (Senator King) Rejected (28-15) 53C
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Motion Reconsider (Senator Young) Adopted (29-15) 53C
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Motion Limit Debate (Senator Young) Adopted (29-15) 53C
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Committee Amendment {968576/1 Adopted 53C
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 53C
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Floor Amendment {653729/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (17-28) 53C
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Floor Amendment {103621/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected 53C
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53C
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Smith) Rejected (29-15) 53C
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/1/2020 10:23 AM