Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Recycling - Hotels
Sponsored by
Delegates Smith, Acevero, Anderson, Boyce, Bridges, Charkoudian, Ivey, R. Lewis, Lierman, Lopez, Love, Mosby, Queen, Solomon, Stewart, and Wells
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an owner, an operator, or a manager of a hotel to provide recycling for the guests of the hotel and recycle certain materials on or before October 1, 2021; requiring the recycling be carried out in accordance with a certain recycling plan; authorizing a county to require an owner, an operator, or a manager of a hotel to report certain information to the county in a certain manner; authorizing certain entities to conduct certain inspections; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Recycling - Hotels
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Text - First - Environment - Recycling - Hotels
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1711.1 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:14 PM