Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education
Sponsored by
Delegates Kaiser, D. Barnes, Ebersole, Fennell, Hixson, C. Howard, Jones, Luedtke, McIntosh, Patterson, Platt, Tarlau, Turner, Walker, A. Washington, and M. Washington
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 702
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education; requiring specified appointments to be made to ensure diversity within the Commission; requiring the Commission to review the findings and recommendations of a specified study, review specified education finance formulas, and review specified accountability measures; requiring a specified master plan to include specified information for calendar years 2016 and 2017; requiring the State Department of Education to convene a specified stakeholders group; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0905
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {605663/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 702
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments {605663/2 Report Adopted 46
House 3/17/2016 3/14/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 48
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 47A
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2016 4/06/2016 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 702
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:26 AM