Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Fairness in Taxation for Retirees Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Krebs, Walker, Afzali, Aumann, Cluster, Elliott, George, Haddaway-Riccio, Hogan, McComas, McDermott, W. Miller, Myers, Schuh, Smigiel, Stocksdale, and Szeliga
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Including income from specified retirement plans within a subtraction modification allowed under the Maryland income tax for retired individuals who are at least 65 years old or who are disabled or whose spouse is disabled; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2012; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1129 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/08/2013 Text - First - Fairness in Taxation for Retirees Act
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-209 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM