Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Chief Executive Officer
Sponsored by
Delegate Feldmark
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the title of the Executive Director of the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to be the Chief Executive Officer; making conforming changes; and authorizing the publisher of the Annotated Code of Maryland to make certain changes in a certain manner.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0308
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {705964/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
47B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Chief Executive Officer
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable with Amendments {705964/1 Adopted 45
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Text - Third - Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Chief Executive Officer
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 47B
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Referred Finance 48
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/16/2020 6:04 PM