Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Records - Shielding - Nonviolent Misdemeanor Convictions
Sponsored by
Delegates Anderson, Waldstreicher, Braveboy, Carter, Conaway, Dumais, Haynes, Ivey, Swain, Valderrama, and M. Washington
Status
In the Senate - Special Order until 11:55 (Senator Brochin) Adopted (28-19)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to petition the court to shield specified court records and police records relating to a conviction of the person no earlier than 5 years after the person satisfies the sentence imposed for the conviction, including parole, probation, or mandatory supervision; providing that, if the person is convicted of a new crime during a specified time period, the original conviction is not eligible for shielding unless the new conviction becomes eligible for shielding; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/23/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {222214/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (99-38)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {218474/1
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Raskin) Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {218474/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Brochin) {623926/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {483726/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (41-6)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Delegates Simmons, K. Kelly, and McComas
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Senators Gladden, Jacobs, and Raskin
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (111-28)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Special Order until 11:55 (Senator Brochin) Adopted (28-19)
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 2/12/2013 2/12/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/22/2013 3/23/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {222214/1 Report Adopted 53A
House 3/23/2013 3/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53A
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted 54
House 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (99-38) 54
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 52
Senate 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable with Amendments {218474/1 60
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Raskin) Adopted 60
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Favorable with Amendments {218474/1 Report Adopted 61A
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Brochin) {623926/1 Adopted 61A
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61A
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Special Order until later today (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {483726/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (41-6) 62
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 House Requests Senate Recede 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Delegates Simmons, K. Kelly, and McComas 66
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Senate Refuses to Recede 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Conference Committee Appointed 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Senators Gladden, Jacobs, and Raskin 65
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Conference Committee Report Adopted 69
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Third Reading Passed (111-28) 69
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Special Order until 11:55 (Senator Brochin) Adopted (28-19) 68
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-301 through 10-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM