Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Freedom to Vote Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Luedtke, Hettleman, Hixson, Rosenberg, M. Washington, Moon, Reznik, Smith, A. Washington, Anderson, Angel, Atterbeary, Barkley, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Barve, Branch, Brooks, Busch, Carr, Clippinger, Conaway, Cullison, Davis, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Frush, Gaines, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hammen, Hayes, Haynes, Healey, Hill, Holmes, C. Howard, Jackson, Jalisi, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Knotts, Korman, Kramer, Krimm, Lafferty, Lam, Lierman, McCray, McIntosh, A. Miller, Morales, Morhaim, Oaks, Patterson, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Platt, Proctor, B. Robinson, S. Robinson, Sanchez, Stein, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, Walker, C. Wilson, and P. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring State agencies that are deemed electronic voter registration agencies to implement electronic voter registration systems on or before July 1, 2017; requiring the State Board of Elections to register individuals whose voter registration information is transmitted to the Board through an electronic voter registration system; requiring a public institution of higher education to provide a link to the online voter registration system on the home page of the online portal used by students to register for course work; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 5 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {695067/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {925962/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Kipke) {523224/1 Rejected (49-81)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (93-43)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {834231/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Waugh) Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {944633/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
71
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Krebs) Adopted
Proceedings
71
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (105-36)
Proceedings
71
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
71
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2016 3/19/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments {695067/1 Report Adopted 49
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Floor Committee Amendment {925962/1 Adopted 49
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Special Order until later today (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 49
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Special Order until later today (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 50
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Kipke) {523224/1 Rejected (49-81) 50
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (93-43) 51
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49
Senate 3/24/2016 3/24/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable with Amendments {834231/2 Report Adopted 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Waugh) Adopted 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Floor Committee Amendment {944633/1 Adopted 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Middleton) Adopted 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 66
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 71
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Special Order until later today (Delegate Krebs) Adopted 71
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Third Reading Passed (105-36) 71
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Passed Enrolled 71
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 3-102, 3-203, 3-204, 3-204.2, 3-506 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM