Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homeowner's Insurance and Renter's Insurance - Adjustment and Settlement Practices
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring insurers that provide homeowner's insurance and renter's insurance in the State to employ specified adjusters in the State for specified purposes; prohibiting an adjuster who is employed by an insurer from making specified representations; prohibiting a public adjuster whom a specified insurer engages from making specified representations; prohibiting a specified insurer from misrepresenting or allowing specified adjusters to misrepresent a specified relationship; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2015 3/20/2015 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
(   10-401, 10-402, 19-111.1, 27-303, 27-304, 27-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page