Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Delegates Beidle, Lierman, B. Barnes, Branch, Brooks, Busch, Clippinger, Fennell, Frush, Haynes, Healey, Hixson, Holmes, C. Howard, Krimm, Lafferty, McCray, McIntosh, Moon, Reznik, Tarlau, and P. Young
Status
Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 36
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing State transportation goals; establishing measures by which the Department of Transportation is required to score the extent to which major capital projects satisfy the goals; requiring the Department to develop a project-based scoring system and promulgate specified regulations; requiring the Department, in accordance with the specified project-based scoring system, to rank major transportation projects for inclusion in the draft and final Consolidated Transportation Program; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0908
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
House 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
House 3/17/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Favorable with Amendments {274561/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Flanagan) {413224/1 Rejected (51-88) 48
House 3/18/2016 3/16/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Motion vote previous question (Delegate Vaughn) Withdrawn 49
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Motion vote previous question (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted 49
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Third Reading Passed (84-51) 49
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation 48A
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {499432/1 53
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Laid Over (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 53
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Favorable with Amendments {499432/1 54
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Special Order until 3/30 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 54
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable with Amendments {499432/1 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Committee Amendment Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Motion Re-referred Finance (Senator Hershey)
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Special Order until later today (President) Adopted 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Motion Re-referred Finance (Senator Hershey) Rejected (15-29) 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable with Amendments 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Motion limit debate (Senator Pugh) Adopted (30-15) 55
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (28-16) 55
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {453329/1 Rejected (17-29) 56
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Ready) {733129/1 Rejected (17-29) 56
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {183229/2 Rejected (17-29) 56
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {593029/1 Rejected (17-29) 56
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {483924/1 Rejected (18-28) 56
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Cassilly) {263922/1 Rejected (17-29) 56
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Committee Amendment (Budget and Taxation) {129430/2 Adopted 56
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 56
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {593125/1 Rejected (17-27) 56A
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Reilly) {703021/1 Rejected (17-27) 56A
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {953926/1 Rejected (17-27) 56A
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Hershey) {953925/1 Rejected (17-28) 56A
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (28-17) 56A
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 58A
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Motion Special Order until 4/4 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (49-85) 58A
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (83-51) 58A
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 Passed Enrolled 58A
Post Passage 4/04/2016 4/01/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Motion vote previous question (Delegate Vaughn) Adopted 63
House 4/07/2016 4/07/2016 Veto overridden (88-52) 63
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Veto overridden (29-17) 62
Post Passage 4/09/2016 4/01/2016 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 36
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
3/31/2016 Amendments Senate - (Budget and Taxation) {129430/02 Adopted
3/31/2016 Amendments Senate - (Senator Jennings) {183229/02 Rejected
3/31/2016 Amendments Senate - (Senator Cassilly) {263922/01 Rejected
3/31/2016 Amendments Senate - (Senator Hershey) {453329/01 Rejected
3/31/2016 Amendments Senate - (Senator Jennings) {483924/01 Rejected
3/30/2016 Amendments Senate - (Budget and Taxation) {499432/01 Adopted
3/31/2016 Amendments Senate - (Senator Jennings) {593029/01 Rejected
3/31/2016 Amendments Senate - (Senator Jennings) {593125/01 Rejected
3/31/2016 Amendments Senate - (Senator Reilly) {703021/01 Rejected
3/31/2016 Amendments Senate - (Senator Ready) {733129/01 Rejected
3/31/2016 Amendments Senate - (Senator Hershey) {953925/01 Rejected
3/31/2016 Amendments Senate - (Senator Hershey) {953926/01 Rejected
3/18/2016 Amendments House - (Appropriations) {274561/01 Adopted
3/18/2016 Amendments House - (Delegate Flanagan) {413224/01 Rejected
2/10/2016 Text - First - Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016
3/18/2016 Text - Third - Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016
3/31/2016 Text - Enrolled - Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016
4/22/2016 Text - Chapter - Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016
9/19/2016 Governor's Veto Letter
3/21/2016 Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
3/17/2016 Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
3/28/2016 Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
3/16/2016 Vote - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Flanagan) {413224/1 Rejected (51-88) - 03/16/16
3/17/2016 Vote - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (84-51) - 03/17/16
3/26/2016 Vote - House Floor - Motion Special Order until 4/4 (Kipke) Rejected (49-85) - 03/26/16
3/26/2016 Vote - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (83-51) - 03/26/16
3/31/2016 Vote - House Floor - overridden (88-52) - 03/31/16
3/26/2016 Vote - Senate Floor - Motion Re-referred Finance (Hershey) Rejected (15-29) - 03/26/16
3/26/2016 Vote - Senate Floor - Motion limit debate (Pugh) Adopted (30-15) - 03/26/16
3/26/2016 Vote - Senate Floor - Favorable with Amendments Adopted (28-16) - 03/26/16
3/27/2016 Vote - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Hershey) {453329/1 Rejected (17-29) - 03/27/16
3/27/2016 Vote - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Ready) {733129/1 Rejected (17-29) - 03/27/16
3/27/2016 Vote - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Jennings) {183229/2 Rejected (17-29) - 03/27/16
3/27/2016 Vote - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Jennings) {593029/1 Rejected (17-29) - 03/27/16
3/27/2016 Vote - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Jennings) {483924/1 Rejected (18-28) - 03/27/16
3/27/2016 Vote - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Cassilly) {263922/1 Rejected (17-29) - 03/27/16
3/27/2016 Vote - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Jennings) {593125/1 Rejected (17-27) - 03/27/16
3/27/2016 Vote - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Reilly) {703021/1 Rejected (17-27) - 03/27/16
3/27/2016 Vote - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Hershey) {953926/1 Rejected (17-27) - 03/27/16
3/27/2016 Vote - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Hershey) {953925/1 Rejected (17-28) - 03/27/16
3/27/2016 Vote - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (28-17) - 03/27/16
4/02/2016 Vote - Senate Floor - overridden (29-17) - 04/02/16
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-103.1, 2-103.7 )
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:12 PM