Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Referendum - Sports Wagering
Sponsored by
Delegates Turner, Kaiser, Ebersole, Luedtke, Walker, Buckel, Hornberger, and Rose
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that the General Assembly may authorize, by law, the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission to issue certain sports wagering licenses; providing that a license may be issued only to the holder of a video lottery operation license or a license for mile thoroughbred racing or harness racing; declaring the intent of the General Assembly that State revenues generated by the proposed sports wagering be used for dedicated purposes including public education; submitting the Act to a referendum of the qualified voters of the State; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Referendum - Sports Wagering
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable with Amendments {395665/1 Adopted 44
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Expansion of Commercial Gaming - Referendum - Sports Wagering
House 3/15/2018 3/12/2018 Third Reading Passed (124-14) 46
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Budget and Taxation 48
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:14 PM