Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Public Safety and Policing Workgroup - Recommendations
Sponsored by
The Speaker (By Request - Workgroup on Public Safety and Policing) and Delegates Anderson, Atterbeary, Clippinger, Folden, Hayes, Jackson, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, B. Wilson, and C. Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 519
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting retaliatory personnel action against a law enforcement officer who discloses specified information; authorizing the appointment to an administrative hearing board a member of the public who has received specified training; establishing the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission as an independent commission in the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services; establishing the Community Law Enforcement Program Fund; requiring the Governor to include an appropriation to the Fund of $500,000 annually; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016, October 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {362818/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate Folden) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Folden) {293226/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-44)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {938871/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-1)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Delegates Anderson, Atterbeary, and Vallario
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Senate Refuses to Recede
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Senators Zirkin, McFadden, and Hough
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
71
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (90-49)
Proceedings
71
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Conference Committee Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 519
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable with Amendments {362818/1 Report Adopted 50
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Special Order until later today (Delegate Folden) Adopted 50
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Folden) {293226/1 Adopted 50
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (92-44) 51
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 49
Senate 4/07/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {938871/2 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-1) 63
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 67
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 House Requests Senate Recede 67
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 67
House 4/09/2016 4/04/2016 Delegates Anderson, Atterbeary, and Vallario 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Senate Refuses to Recede 64
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Conference Committee Appointed 64
Senate 4/11/2016 4/04/2016 Senators Zirkin, McFadden, and Hough 64
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 71
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Third Reading Passed (90-49) 71
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Conference Committee Report Adopted 67
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 67
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Passed Enrolled 67
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 519
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-103, 3-104, 3-107, 3-201, 3-202, 3-203, 3-204, 3-206 through 3-209, 3-514 through 3-519, 4-601 through 4-603 )
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:26 AM