Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Law – Jury Proceedings – Fundamental Rights
Sponsored by
Delegate Cox
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that a court may not terminate, limit, or regulate a right of a party that is enumerated in the United States Constitution or the Maryland Constitution and recognized by certain court precedent without providing the affected party the opportunity for a jury proceeding on the issue; prohibiting a court from issuing a certain final protective order over the objection of the respondent without first providing the respondent an opportunity to elect a jury proceeding on the facts and matters relating to the order; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Civil Law – Jury Proceedings – Fundamental Rights
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Civil Law – Jury Proceedings – Fundamental Rights
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
(   1-202, 4-506, 9-101 )
(   11-205.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page