Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estate Tax and Income Tax - Marital Deduction and Subtraction Modification for Health Insurance
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Arora, Barve, Carr, Feldman, Gutierrez, Lee, Luedtke, A. Miller, Mizeur, and S. Robinson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that, for purposes of calculating Maryland estate tax, the surviving spouse of a decedent shall include any individual to whom, at the time of the decedent's death, the decedent was lawfully married under State law; providing an income tax subtraction modification for specified costs incurred by a taxpayer to provide health insurance for the taxpayer's spouse; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0658
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0041 Session: 2007 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {545163/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/08/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable with Amendments {545163/1 Report Adopted 64
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 65
Senate 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 First Reading Senate Rules 64
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2013 4/08/2013 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Second Reading Passed 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/06/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 68
House 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-208, 7-309 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM