Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Firearms - Handgun Permit - Preliminary Approval
Sponsored by
Delegates Rey, Bromwell, Buckel, Carey, Clark, Cluster, Fisher, Glass, S. Howard, Malone, McConkey, Morgan, Parrott, Queen, Saab, Simonaire, B. Wilson, and C. Wilson
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to apply for preliminary approval of a handgun permit without completing a certified firearms training course; requiring the Secretary to investigate an application for a handgun permit; requiring the Secretary to issue preliminary approval for a handgun permit if the applicant meets specified requirements except the required certified firearms training course; requiring an applicant to satisfy a specified firearm training requirement within 120 days after receipt of preliminary approval; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Firearms - Handgun Permit - Preliminary Approval
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate Lierman) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Firearms - Handgun Permit - Preliminary Approval
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-41)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {313322/1 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted (24-23)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Hough) Adopted (30-16)
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {313322/1 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Firearms - Handgun Permit - Preliminary Approval
House 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable Adopted 48
House 3/17/2017 3/14/2017 Motion Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate Lierman) Adopted 48
House 3/20/2017 3/16/2017 Second Reading Passed 50
Text - Third - Firearms - Handgun Permit - Preliminary Approval
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (97-41) 51
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48
Senate 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Floor Amendment {313322/1 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted (24-23) 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Hough) Adopted (30-16) 63A
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable Adopted 64
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Floor Amendment {313322/1 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted 64
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Madaleno) Adopted 64
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-301, 5-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM