Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Student Report Cards - Required Information
Sponsored by
Delegates Szeliga, Buckel, Hornberger, and Shoemaker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each local school system, beginning in the 2016-1017 school year, to include on specified information on student report cards; requiring specified information to be presented in a specified manner; requiring the State Department of Education to develop a specified system of grading public schools in the State based on specified performance levels of a specified State assessment; requiring the Department to make a specified notification before the start of a specified school year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-121, 7-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM