Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Alcohol and Tobacco Commission
Sponsored by
Delegate Miller (By Request - Task Force to Study State Alcohol Regulation, Enforcement, Safety, and Public Health)
Status
Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 12
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Alcohol and Tobacco Commission; expressing the legislative intent that the Field Enforcement Division (FED) in the Office of the Comptroller be transferred to the Commission by July 1, 2020; establishing certain powers and duties for the Commission in addition to those transferred from the Comptroller's office; requiring the Commission to conduct certain studies related to the alcohol and tobacco industries and to develop certain best practices; requiring the Governor to appoint an Executive Director of the Commission; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0703
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Alcohol, Tobacco, and Motor Fuel Commission
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {853591/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Alcohol and Tobacco Commission
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-36)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {584737/1
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {584737/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {763925/1 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {783125/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (14-29)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-15)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-37)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Alcohol and Tobacco Commission
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Overridden (98-39)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Overridden (30-16)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 12
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Alcohol and Tobacco Commission
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Alcohol, Tobacco, and Motor Fuel Commission
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing canceled
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments {853591/1 Adopted 41
House 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
Text - Third - Alcohol and Tobacco Commission
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 42
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Third Reading Passed (97-36) 42
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 42
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments {584737/1 46
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 46
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {584737/1 Adopted 47
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Floor Amendment {763925/1 (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 47
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Floor Amendment {783125/1 (Senator Cassilly) Rejected (14-29) 47
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (30-15) 48
House 3/20/2019 3/16/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 51
House 3/20/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (96-37) 51
House 3/20/2019 3/16/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Alcohol and Tobacco Commission
Post Passage 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter
House 3/28/2019 3/20/2019 Overridden (98-39) 55
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Overridden (30-16) 56
Post Passage 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 12
Text - Chapter - Alcohol and Tobacco Commission
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 1-301, 1-302, 1-302.1, 1-303 through 1-308, 1-309, 1-310 )
(   16.5-101, 16.5-102, 16.5-203, 16.5-204, 16.5-205, 16.5-207 through 16.5-211, 16.5-213, 16.5-214, 16.5-215, 16.5-216, 16.5-217, 16.7-101, 16.7-102, 16.7-202, 16.7-203, 16.7-206 through 16.7-210, 16.7-212, 16.7-213, 16-101, 16-102, 16-201, 16-204, 16-205, 16-206, 16-207, 16-208 through 16-213, 16-216, 16-218, 16-219, 16-220 through 16-222, 16-223, 16-302, 16-306, 16-307, 16-308.1, 16-3B-01 )
(   13-203 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:25 AM