Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Causes - Court Records
Sponsored by
Delegates Williams, Bartlett, Cox, Crutchfield, W. Fisher, J. Lewis, Lopez, and Shetty
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 419
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that a provision of law that provides for the confidentiality of certain court records pertaining to certain children does not prohibit review of a court record by the Department of Juvenile Services if the Department is providing treatment, services, or care to a child who is subject of the record; and altering a certain exception to a provision of law that provides for the confidentiality of certain court records pertaining to certain children.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Causes - Court Records
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Juvenile Causes - Court Records
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 419
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Juvenile Causes - Court Records
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Juvenile Causes - Court Records
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable Adopted 43A
House 3/09/2020 3/06/2020 Second Reading Passed 43A
Text - Third - Juvenile Causes - Court Records
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 45
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 46
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Second Reading Passed 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 419
Text - Chapter - Juvenile Causes - Court Records
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:18 PM