Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Law - Dealers' Facilities - Internet Locations
Sponsored by
Delegates Frush, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Healey, Holmes, Lafferty, Lam, Mautz, A. Miller, S. Robinson, Tarlau, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, and C. Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Defining "dealer's facility" and "dealership facility" to include any Internet location where a dealer conducts the business authorized by its license, for purposes of specified prohibitions on the coercion of motor vehicle dealers by motor vehicle manufacturers, distributors, and factory branches.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0559
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2015 3/16/2015 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
(   15-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page