Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Consumer Protection - News Analysis Programs - Disclaimer (Truthiness Act of 2019)
Sponsored by
Delegate P. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a certain television or radio station that broadcasts a certain news analysis program in the State to broadcast a certain disclaimer at the beginning of the program; and establishing certain penalties.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Consumer Protection - News Analysis Programs - Disclaimer (Truthiness Act of 2019)
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-4201 through 14-4203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM