Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer Festivals Ho. Co. 09-14
Sponsored by
Howard County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Howard County Board of License Commissioners to issue a special beer festival license; specifying that a special beer festival license authorizes the holder to display and sell at retail beer for consumption on and off the licensed premises on specified days and hours; requiring an applicant for a special beer festival license to be the holder of a specified license; establishing a license fee of $50 for a 1-day or 2-day festival; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 Favorable with Amendments {363098/1 Report Adopted 43A
House 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43A
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 44
Senate 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 43
Senate 3/13/2014 3/13/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed 58
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:12 PM