Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Off-Highway Recreational Vehicle Fund - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Folden, Beitzel, and Anderton
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Off-Highway Recreational Vehicle Fund in the Department of Natural Resources; providing that the Fund consists of certain money and certain revenue; requiring the Fund to be used for the acquisition, construction, and maintenance of trails for use by off-highway recreational vehicles; requiring the Comptroller to transfer one-third of the revenue from the excise tax imposed for each certificate of title issued for an off-highway recreational vehicle to the Fund; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1030
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicle Fund - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {920218/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicle Fund - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicle Fund - Establishment
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing canceled
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {920218/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Off-Highway Recreational Vehicle Fund - Establishment
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
(   11-140.1, 12-120, 13-802 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page