Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Aggressive Driving
Sponsored by
Delegate C. Howard
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reducing, from three to two, the number of specified offenses that a person must commit at the same time or during a single and continuous period of driving that constitutes aggressive driving; and increasing the maximum criminal fine for aggressive driving to $1,000.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0566 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/13/2015 2/16/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/17/2015 Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Aggressive Driving
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-402, 21-901.2, 21-905, 27-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM