Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates - Celebrating Maryland Native Plants and Pollinators
Sponsored by
Delegates Afzali and Carter
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to develop and make available a specially designed registration plate celebrating Maryland native plants and pollinators; prescribing who may apply for and the classes of vehicles eligible for the registration plate; providing the manner in which fees will be established, collected, and distributed in connection with the registration plate; requiring the Administration to consult with the University of Maryland Extension Home & Garden Information Center on specified matters; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2016 3/19/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-619.4, 13-903 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM