Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Investor-Owned Electric Companies - Acquisition of Substantial Influence - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegates Miller, Arentz, Howard, and Mautz
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 721
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting acquisition of substantial influence over an investor-owned electric company if a person would become an affiliate of each investor-owned electric company in the State as a result of the acquisition.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/25/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 721
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Investor-Owned Electric Companies - Acquisition of Substantial Influence - Prohibition
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Investor-Owned Electric Companies - Acquisition of Substantial Influence - Prohibition
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Finance 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2019 3/20/2019 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2019 3/29/2019 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Favorable Adopted 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2019 3/25/2019 Second Reading Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Returned Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 721
Text - Chapter - Investor-Owned Electric Companies - Acquisition of Substantial Influence - Prohibition
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page