Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
**Veto override
   HB1106 - 2016RS
   CH0001 - 2017RS
Title
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard Revisions
Sponsored by
Delegates Frick, Davis, B. Barnes, Barkley, Barron, Barve, Brooks, Clippinger, Cullison, Dumais, Ebersole, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Healey, Hill, Hixson, Jalisi, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Lam, Lierman, Luedtke, A. Miller, Moon, Morhaim, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Reznik, S. Robinson, Smith, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, and A. Washington
Status
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 1 of 2017
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the renewable energy portfolio standard percentage derived from solar energy for specified years; altering the renewable energy portfolio standard percentage derived from Tier 1 renewable sources for specified years; authorizing the Small, Minority, and Women-Owned Businesses Account to receive money from the Strategic Energy Investment Fund; requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to study the workforce development training needs for the clean energy industry in the State; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0921
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {653295/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate Frick) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {523720/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-43)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {507779/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {343522/1
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator McFadden) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {343522/1
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {343522/1 Rejected (16-29)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-14)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (92-46)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/27/2016
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/17 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/24 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/24/2017
Legislative Date
1/24/2017
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/31 (Delegate Frick) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Veto overridden (88-51)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Veto overridden (32-13)
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 1 of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable with Amendments {653295/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/17/2016 3/15/2016 Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate Frick) Adopted 47
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {523720/1 Withdrawn 49
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (92-43) 50
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Finance 48A
Senate 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments {507779/1 Report Adopted 61A
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/03/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Ready) Adopted 63A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {343522/1 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator McFadden) Adopted 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {343522/1 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 65
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Hough) {343522/1 Rejected (16-29) 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (32-14) 66
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 House Concur - Senate Amendments 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (92-46) 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Passed Enrolled 70
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/27/2016 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/17 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
House 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/24 (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted
House 1/24/2017 1/24/2017 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/31 (Delegate Frick) Adopted
House 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Veto overridden (88-51)
Senate 1/31/2017 2/02/2017 Veto overridden (32-13)
Post Passage 1/31/2017 2/02/2017 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 1 of 2017
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-702, 7-703, 7-705 )
(   9-1A-35, 9-20B-01, 9-20B-05 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM