Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Public Safety – Elevator Inspections – Testing and Apprenticeship Program
Sponsored by
Delegate Wilson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that a certain test on an elevator unit performed in connection with a certain inspection be performed by a certain licensed elevator mechanic; requiring a third-party qualified elevator inspector to be physically present during a certain test; authorizing a certain licensed elevator mechanic to perform a certain test in the presence of a qualified elevator inspector; requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to establish an apprenticeship program for third-party qualified elevator inspectors; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0831
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Safety - Elevator Inspections - Testing
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Favorable with Amendments {263298/1 Adopted 44
House 3/13/2018 3/10/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Public Safety – Elevator Inspections – Testing and Apprenticeship Program
House 3/14/2018 3/11/2018 Third Reading Passed (119-17) 45
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Referred Finance 47
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable with Amendments {537371/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Floor Amendment {543122/1 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (45-0) 60
House 4/07/2018 3/31/2018 House Concurs Senate Amendments 65
House 4/07/2018 3/31/2018 Third Reading Passed (115-22) 65
House 4/07/2018 3/31/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Public Safety – Elevator Inspections – Testing and Apprenticeship Program
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Text - Chapter - Public Safety – Elevator Inspections – Testing and Apprenticeship Program
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-806, 12-809, 12-810, 12-812 )
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:14 PM