Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Procurement - Use of Electronic Means to Conduct Procurement
Sponsored by
Delegates McMillan, Barron, Bromwell, Hayes, Krebs, Miele, Morgan, Pena-Melnyk, Sanchez, and Wilson
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, beginning July 1, 2020, a primary procurement unit to conduct procurement by electronic means; and authorizing a bidder or an offeror to elect to submit a bid or an offer and conduct each element of a certain procurement contract in hard copy form.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Procurement - Use of Electronic Means to Conduct Procurement
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Procurement - Use of Electronic Means to Conduct Procurement
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page