Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems
Sponsored by
Delegates Frick, Branch, Carey, Clippinger, Kelly, Lisanti, and Valderrama
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a ticket issuer from using a nontransferable ticketing system except under specified circumstances; prohibiting a purchaser or a seller of a ticket from being penalized, discriminated against, or denied access to an event under specified circumstances; authorizing a ticket issuer, an operator of a venue, or an agent of the operator to maintain and enforce specified policies, establish specified limits, revoke or restrict specified tickets, and opt not to sell tickets in a specified form under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0892
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Nontransferable Ticketing Systems
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-4001 through 14-4003, 14-4002, 14-4003 )
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:33 AM