Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Howard County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation Ho. Co. 7-18
Sponsored by
Howard County Delegation
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 837
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the annual compensation of the judges of the Orphans' Court for Howard County for fiscal years 2019 through 2022; and providing for the application of the Act.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Howard County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation Ho. Co. 7-18
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Howard County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation Ho. Co. 7-18
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 837
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Howard County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation Ho. Co. 7-18
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Howard County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation Ho. Co. 7-18
House 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 41
Text - Third - Howard County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation Ho. Co. 7-18
House 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 42
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Judicial Proceedings 43
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62A
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 837
Text - Chapter - Howard County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation Ho. Co. 7-18
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM