Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Community Colleges - Workforce Readiness Grant Program - Established
Sponsored by
Delegates Solomon, Acevero, Chang, Ebersole, Haynes, Hettleman, Jones, Kerr, Kittleman, J. Lewis, Lierman, McKay, Wilkins, and P. Young
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Workforce Readiness Grant Program to provide matching grants to a community college to improve the community college's technology; authorizing each community college to accept certain donations that further the purpose of the Program; authorizing the Governor, in fiscal years 2022 and 2024, to appropriate for each community college supplemental funding equal to the lesser of $250,000 for each campus of each community college or the amount of certain donations in certain fiscal years; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0515
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Community Colleges - Workforce Readiness Grant Program - Established
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable with Amendments {804264/1 Adopted 58
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Text - Third - Community Colleges - Workforce Readiness Grant Program - Established
House 4/03/2019 3/25/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 60
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Referred Rules 61
Senate 4/05/2019 4/05/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Favorable Adopted 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/01/2019 Second Reading Passed 64
Senate 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 65
House 4/08/2019 4/02/2019 Returned Passed 68
Post Passage 5/24/2019 5/24/2019 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-321 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:34 AM