Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Mandatory Coverage - Medical and Hospital Benefits
Sponsored by
Delegate Donoghue
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each insurer that provides motor vehicle liability insurance in the State to provide specified medical and hospital benefits to specified individuals under specified circumstances; establishing the minimum amount of coverage and the qualifying expenses that may be claimed under the coverage; authorizing the exclusion of specified benefits from coverage for specified individuals under specified circumstances; providing for coordination of benefits of the coverage with other motor vehicle liability insurance; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2013 2/07/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2013 3/12/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
(   19-505.1, 19-507, 19-508 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page