Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Board of Electricians - Licensing and Regulation of Electricians - Phase Out of Apprentice, Journeyperson, and Master Level Local Licenses
Sponsored by
Delegate Haddaway-Riccio
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Changing the name of the State Board of Master Electricians to the Board of Electricians; authorizing the Board to issue an apprentice license and a journeyperson license; authorizing the Board to adopt a State electrical code; altering duties and membership of the Board; requiring a county to enforce the State electrical code or a specified local electrical code; establishing a licensing exception for a person that provides limited energy services or that is licensed or registered to provide security systems services; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0877
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014, October 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/24/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/25/2014 3/20/2014 Favorable with Amendments {553099/1 Report Adopted 56
House 3/25/2014 3/20/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
House 3/26/2014 3/21/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 57
Senate 3/27/2014 3/20/2014 First Reading Senate Rules 54
Senate 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:13 PM