Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Hemp Research and Production
Sponsored by
Delegates Fraser-Hidalgo, Cassilly, Barve, Gilchrist, Jacobs, Otto, Stein, and Wivell
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the name of the Industrial Hemp Pilot Program to be the Hemp Research Pilot Program; establishing the Hemp Farming Program to promote hemp as an agricultural commodity in the State, the commercial sale of hemp products within and outside the State and to facilitate the research of hemp and hemp products; requiring the Department of Agriculture, in consultation with the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission, to adopt regulations to protect hemp growers and medical cannabis growers from the risk of cross-pollination; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Agriculture - Hemp Research and Production
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Favorable with Amendments {730314/1 Adopted 44
House 3/12/2019 3/09/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Agriculture - Hemp Research and Production
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 45
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 46
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Favorable with Amendments {644730/1 Adopted 56
Senate 3/28/2019 3/24/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
Senate 4/02/2019 3/27/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 59
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 House Concurs Senate Amendments 59
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 59
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Agriculture - Hemp Research and Production
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Text - Chapter - Agriculture - Hemp Research and Production
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-101, 14-102, 14-201, 14-301 through 14-309 )
(   5-101 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:34 AM