Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2019
Sponsored by
Delegates Carey and Hill
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing and strengthening consumer protections in certain areas of financial transactions, including mobile home purchases, security breaches, vehicle purchases, money transmission, and other areas; applying certain existing financial consumer protections to new forms of financial transactions; establishing that a mobile home retailer has a duty of good faith and fair dealing; prohibiting a mobile home retailer from steering a consumer borrower to products that offer less favorable terms; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0786
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019, October 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Financial Consumer Protection Act of 2019
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-1001, 12-101, 12-1021, 12-115, 12-901, 12-921, 14-1901, 14-1906.1, 14-3501, 14-3503, 14-3504, 14-3504.1 )
(   11-501, 11-503.1, 11-601, 11-610, 12-1101 through 12-1129, 12-401, 12-407, 12-414.1 through 12-414.3, 12-425, 2-105.1 )
(   7-601 through 7-605 )
(   15-311.4 )
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:34 AM