Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Renewable Energy - Offshore Wind Projects - Distance Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Adams, Arentz, Aumann, Carozza, S. Howard, Jacobs, W. Miller, and Otto
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering from between 10 to 30 to not less than 26 nautical miles the distances required of certain qualified offshore wind projects from the State shoreline; prohibiting the Public Service Commission from approving certain offshore wind projects unless certain wind turbines are installed; requiring certain wind turbines to be installed in a certain manner for certain purposes; excluding from the calculation of certain ORECs the generation or capacity of certain wind turbines; requiring the Commission to enter a certain order; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1058
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Renewable Energy - Offshore Wind Projects - Distance Requirements
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-701, 7-704.1, 7-704.2 )
Last Updated: 11/6/2019 4:14 PM