Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Gaming - Charitable Casino Events
Sponsored by
Delegate Luedtke
Status
In the House - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Luedtke)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing specified qualified organizations to conduct specified charitable casino events; prohibiting qualified organizations from operating specified gaming devices; requiring that charitable casino events be managed by members of qualified organizations; prohibiting individuals from benefiting financially from charitable casino events; authorizing charitable casino events to occur with a specified frequency and in a specified manner; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {285262/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/12 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Luedtke) {213523/2 Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {513823/1 Adopted (75-57)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Luedtke)
Proceedings
49
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Favorable with Amendments {285262/2 Report Adopted 44
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Special Order until 3/12 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 44
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Special Order until 3/14 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted 45
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Luedtke) {213523/2 Adopted 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) {513823/1 Adopted (75-57) 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Special Order until 3/15 (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted 47
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Luedtke) 49
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-101, 12-103, 12-113, 13-101, 13-2A-01 through 13-2A-07 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM