Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Rental Motor Vehicles - Collision Damage Waivers
Sponsored by
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "passenger car" to include a certain Class E (truck) vehicle for the purposes of the application of certain provisions of law governing collision damage waivers for rental vehicles.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commercial Law - Rental Motor Vehicles - Collision Damage Waivers
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Commercial Law - Rental Motor Vehicles - Collision Damage Waivers
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
47B
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Commercial Law - Rental Motor Vehicles - Collision Damage Waivers
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 45
Text - Third - Commercial Law - Rental Motor Vehicles - Collision Damage Waivers
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 47B
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Referred Finance 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable Adopted 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/15/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53C
House 3/18/2020 3/16/2020 Returned Passed 53
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/18/2020 4:44 PM