Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Underinsured Motorist Excess Coverage
Sponsored by
Delegate Barkley
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing for an alternative limitation on specified liability for an insurer that provides specified uninsured motorist coverage under specified circumstances; requiring specified insurers to offer underinsured motorist excess coverage; providing for the characteristics of that coverage, including what the coverage insures, how the coverage obligates the issuer, and how the selection of the coverage applies to specified policies and endorsements; providing for waivers of specified coverage in specified manners; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0844
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-509, 19-509.2, 19-510, 19-513 )
(   17-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM