Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit Program
Sponsored by
Anne Arundel County Delegation
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a prohibition, in Anne Arundel County, to prohibit a person from standing, or causing, encouraging, allowing, or petitioning another to stand, in a roadway, a median divider, or an intersection to solicit money or donations from the occupant of a vehicle; authorizing the governing body of the county or of a municipal corporation in the county to enact a specified permit program; authorizing permits for no more than 7 calendar days; requiring the county to develop a plan to include traffic safety training; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {790815/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/19/2015 2/20/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/25/2015 3/26/2015 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 3/26/2015 3/26/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments {790815/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/10/2015 4/05/2015 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 66
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 62
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-507 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM