Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Lapse or Termination of Required Security - Notice
Sponsored by
Delegate Lisanti
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a specified insurer or other provider of required security to immediately provide electronic notice of a specified lapse or termination of required security to the Motor Vehicle Administration and, under specified circustances, the vehicle owner.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2016 3/19/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 49
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Second Reading Passed 49
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 50
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 48A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Reassigned to Finance 48A
Senate 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   17-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM