Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public School Employees - Required Training on Retirement Benefits
Sponsored by
Delegates Vogt, McKay, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to establish a training program for specified public school employees regarding available retirement benefits; requiring the Department to offer the training to public school employees at least once per year; requiring the Department to work in consultation with staff from the State Retirement Agency and staff from the Maryland Supplemental Retirement Plans to provide the training program; requiring public school employees to attend the training each year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1137
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public School Employees - Required Training on Retirement Benefits
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Public School Employees - Required Training on Retirement Benefits
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-122 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM