Bill Search
Bill number does not exist.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Medical Cannabis - Pesticide Use - Labeling and Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, Bartlett, Brooks, Crutchfield, Cullison, D.E. Davis, Ebersole, Feldmark, Haynes, Jalisi, Johnson, Lafferty, R. Lewis, Lierman, McIntosh, Moon, Patterson, Proctor, Sample-Hughes, Smith, Stewart, Sydnor, Terrasa, Valderrama, Wells, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a certain dispensary or dispensary agent to ensure that medical cannabis grown using a pesticide and products containing medical cannabis grown using a pesticide have a label affixed at the time of sale stating that the medical cannabis was grown using pesticides; requiring the Department of Agriculture to study the health impacts of smoking medical cannabis that was grown using pesticides or being in close proximity to smoke from the burning of medical cannabis that was grown using pesticides; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Medical Cannabis - Pesticide Use - Labeling and Study
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 11/22/2019 9:34 AM