Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Social Housing Act of 2019
Sponsored by
Delegates Stewart, Acevero, Charkoudian, Lehman, and Wells
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Social Housing Program in the Division of Development Finance of the Department of Housing and Community Development; establishing the Social Housing Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; requiring the Governor to appropriate $2,500,000,000 in the annual State operating or capital budget to the Fund for fiscal year 2021; altering the State income tax rate for individuals with a certain taxable income; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
Text - First - Department of Housing and Community Development - Social Housing Act of 2019
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   4-103, 4-2501 through 4-2511, 4-512 )
(   10-105, 2-608.2, 2-609 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page