Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Interception of Communication - Financial Institutions
Sponsored by
Delegate Adams
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that it is lawful under certain provisions of law for an employee or agent of a financial institution that accepts deposits in the State to intercept and record a certain oral communication under certain circumstances; providing that a certain audio recording shall be preserved for at least 30 calendar days; requiring a financial institution to adopt an audio recordings retention policy; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0748 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Interception of Communication - Financial Institutions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Interception of Communication - Financial Institutions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Adams) Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 03/13 (Delegate Adams) Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Adams) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Interception of Communication - Financial Institutions
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Interception of Communication - Financial Institutions
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Adams) Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Motion Special Order until 03/13 (Delegate Adams) Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2019 3/11/2019 Motion Recommit to Committee (Delegate Adams) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2019 3/19/2019 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page